HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 09:38:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by California Refrigeration Alc against Cara Furman in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1719
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Furman Cara Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    California Refrigeration & Alc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
6/29/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
(Non-Jury Trial)
8/24/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/24/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order
  • 06/29/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: CALIFORNIA REFRIGERATION & ALC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 06/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: CALIFORNIA REFRIGERATION & ALC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 05/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/29/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010257 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CALIFORNIA REFRIGERATION & ALC (Plaintiff); As to: CARA FURMAN (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --