This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 05:53:53 (UTC).

PATRICK MORRISON VS ELBERT YVONNE YURELL KELLEM JR.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 PATRICK MORRISON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELBERT YVONNE YURELL KELLEM JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1718

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRISON PATRICK

Los Angeles, CA 90008

Defendant

YURELL KELLEM JR. ELBERT YVONNE

Baldwin Park, CA 91706

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

[Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [Payments of $500.00, on the 31st of each month starting 08/31/2017 until paid in full].]

8/25/2017: [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [Payments of $500.00, on the 31st of each month starting 08/31/2017 until paid in full].]

Unknown

8/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/4/2017: Unknown

[Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)]

8/7/2017: [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)]

Unknown

8/4/2017: Unknown

[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

8/4/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

[Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017]

8/4/2017: [Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017]

Unknown

8/4/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017

8/4/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017

(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

8/4/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

7/12/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Order Staying or Recalling Writ of Execution

6/30/2017: Order Staying or Recalling Writ of Execution

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/19/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [Payments of $500.00, on the 31st of each month starting 08/31/2017 until paid in full]. Signed and Filed by: As to: Patrick Morrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) [Payments of $500.00, on the 31st of each month starting 08/31/2017 until paid in full].]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Patrick Morrison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Patrick Morrison against Defendant Elbert Yvonne Yurell Kellem Jr. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Patrick Morrison on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $7,700.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $7,815.00.; Other: Defendant admits owing $7000. Judgment includes interest for one year at 10% of judgment for total judgment of $7700.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Patrick Morrison against Defendant Elbert Yvonne Yurell Kellem Jr. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Patrick Morrison on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $7,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $7,115.00.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Patrick Morrison (Plaintiff); As to: Elbert Yvonne Yurell Kellem Jr. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Patrick Morrison (Plaintiff); As to: Elbert Yvonne Yurell Kellem Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010256 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010256 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less