HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:06

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Timothy David Bright against Suzy Lea Juarez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1716
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Juarez Suzy Lea Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Bright Timothy David
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/3/2017: Minute Order of 07/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
5/24/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( minute order of 05/01/2017 )
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: County: Los Angeles; Principal: 3,538.50; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00
  • 07/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/03/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL ( minute order of 05/01/2017 ): Result: Result Date: 07/03/2017
  • 07/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Timothy David Bright against Defendant Suzy Lea Juarez on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Timothy David Bright on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $3,408.50 and costs of $130.00 for a total of $3,538.50.
  • 05/24/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL ( minute order of 05/01/2017 ); Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 07/03/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Timothy David Bright (Plaintiff); As to: Suzy Lea Juarez (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/24/2017
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 04/24/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 03/02/2017 to 04/24/2017
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Timothy David Bright (Plaintiff); As to: Suzy Lea Juarez (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/04/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Timothy David Bright (Plaintiff); As to: Suzy Lea Juarez (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010252 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --