HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:53:43

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ransford White against Hair Club For Men Llc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1715
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    White Ransford
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Hair Club For Men Llc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement
4/27/2017: Small Claims Settlement Agreement
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ...
3/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED:...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Taken off Calendar by Party on 04/27/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Hair club for Men, LLC (Defendant)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: GABRIELA SANCHEZ, CT CORP AGENT: Result: Result Date: 04/27/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: GABRIELA SANCHEZ, CT CORP AGENT; Filed by: Ransford White (Plaintiff); As to: Hair club for Men, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/02/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ransford White (Plaintiff); As to: Hair club for Men, LLC (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0010251 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --