HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2017 05:54:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Jeffrey Mckinstry against David Childress in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1714
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Childress David Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Mckinstry Jeffrey
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Childress David
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Mckinstry Jeffrey
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
7/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/25/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cla...
6/12/2017: Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cl...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - (AMEN...
6/14/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - (AME...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
8/25/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal...
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/19/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 08/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/25/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/25/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jeffrey McKinstry on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/28/2017 is vacated
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- On the Defendant's Claim filed by David Childress on 04/19/2017, judgment entered on 06/28/2017 is vacated
  • 08/25/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jeffrey McKinstry on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/28/2017 as to David Childress is vacated
  • 08/25/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: David Childress (Defendant)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015522 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/21/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 07/21/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Appeal]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 06/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/28/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim: Result: Result Date: 06/28/2017
  • 06/28/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (AMENDED): Result: Result Date: 06/28/2017
  • 06/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/28/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/28/2017; Result Type to Held
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --