HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:10:03

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Lori Johnson against Linda Peters in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1713
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Johnson Lori
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Peters Linda Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
7/10/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
Unknown
10/10/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
7/10/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/30/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)...
8/11/2017: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Court Order re: EXHIBITS) of 10/10/2...
10/10/2017: Minute Order (Court Order re: EXHIBITS) of 10/10...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
8/11/2017: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal ** PRIORITY **)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/10/2017
  • 10/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal ** PRIORITY **) of 10/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/10/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal ** PRIORITY ** scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/10/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 10/10/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lori Johnson on 03/02/2017 as follows: Defendant Linda Peters does not owe the plaintiff Lori Johnson any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The Court finds that Plaintiff, the tenant in this long-term landlord-tenant relationship, did not meet her burden of proving that Ms. Peters, the defendant landlord, agreed to reimburse plaintiff Ms. Johnson for any of the amounts that are the subject of this suit. The crux of Ms. Johnson's claim is breach of contract, but there was insufficient proof that there was a meeting of the minds on most the items. As to the carpet replacement, there WAS a meeting of the minds but the evidence established that Ms. Peters fulfilled her part of the bargain by accepting half of the cost of the carpet replacement in cash and paying for the full cost directly to the carpet vendor. The fact that Ms. Peters may have claimed a tax deduction for the cost of the carpet does...
  • 10/10/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lori Johnson on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/30/2017 is vacated
  • 10/10/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lori Johnson on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 06/30/2017 as to Linda Peters is vacated
  • 10/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order re: EXHIBITS)
  • 10/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: EXHIBITS) of 10/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 08/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 08/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/11/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 10/10/2017 08:30 AM at 10/10/2017 8:30 AM Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal in Department 8
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Linda Peters (Defendant)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015036 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/10/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 07/10/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --