HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2017 09:41:49

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Fred Tucker against Pacific Sales Kitchen And Bath Center A Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1712
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Tucker Fred
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pacific Sales Kitchen And Bath Center A Corporation Dba Pacific Sales Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
5/26/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/18/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/26/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/30/2017
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/3/2017: Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Va...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial re: Hearing) of 08/23...
8/23/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial re: Hearing) of 08/2...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/30/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial re: Hearing)
  • 08/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial re: Hearing) of 08/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial re: Hearing scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/23/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6
  • 06/30/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Pacific Sales Kitchen and Bath Center, a corporation (Defendant)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 06/30/2017; Disposition Type: Granted; Disposition Date changed from 06/30/2017 to 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Fred Tucker on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/03/2017 is vacated
  • 06/30/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Fred Tucker on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 05/03/2017 as to Pacific Sales Kitchen and Bath Center, a corporation is vacated
  • 05/26/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Pacific Sales Kitchen and Bath Center, a corporation (Defendant)
  • 05/26/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0013420 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/26/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 05/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --