HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:53:31

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Yassine Hmina against Jamison Management Company in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1710
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Jamison Management Company Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Hmina Yassine
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]
7/25/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/25/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/4/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Pay Judgment to Court
7/25/2017: Request to Pay Judgment to Court
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/7/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/5/2017: Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
7/5/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/05/2017 to 08/25/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/25/2017 to 08/25/2017
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/25/2017 to 08/25/2017
  • 08/04/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Yassine Hmina (Plaintiff)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Jamison Management Company (Defendant)
  • 07/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 07/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/05/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/01/2017 to 07/05/2017
  • 07/05/2017
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/05/2017
  • 07/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/05/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Yassine Hmina against Defendant Jamison Management Company on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Yassine Hmina on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $1,328.33 and costs of $118.00 for a total of $1,446.33.; Other: Plaintiff Ms. Hmina seeks half of the $1,150 monthly rent he paid for a four-month period during which roof repairs were not completed after he notified Defendant by email of the water leak problem. The evidence presented at trial shows that Jamison Management Company did not respond to the leaky roof complaint until an extremely heavy rain, collapsed ceiling, and a second email of February 17. Plaintiff testified that it cost him $1,000 to replace his mattress and $100 to overnight in a hotel room, but for every rainy day between November and late February he had to sleep in the living room due to water leaks. He did not have receipts for the mattress purchase or hotel stay, nor did he have any data on the number of ...
  • 05/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 07/05/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/01/2017
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --