HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:53:28

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ocean Front Estates At Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association against Classic Property Management Company Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1709
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Ocean Front Estates At Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Classic Property Management Company Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/27/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
4/27/2017: Minute Order of 04/27/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Nunc Pro Tunc Order scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 02:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Clerical Error on 04/27/2017
  • 04/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/27/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/27/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ocean Front Estates at Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association against Defendant Classic Property Management Company, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ocean Front Estates at Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,115.00.
  • 04/27/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 04/27/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .
  • 04/27/2017
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Ocean Front Estates at Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Classic Property Management Company, Inc. (Defendant); Costs: 65.00; Cost Waived: No
  • 04/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Ocean Front Estates at Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)
  • 04/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170301E2654 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170301E2654 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ocean Front Estates at Rancho Palos Verdes Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Classic Property Management Company, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --