HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2017 09:10:20

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joseph Kinder against Kerri Suzzane Kresinski in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1707
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Ronald Frank
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Kresinski Kerri Suzzane Aka Kerri Kresinski Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Kinder Joseph
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/22/2017: Minute Order of 06/22/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
8/24/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarat...
  Free
Download
(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
10/13/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
10/13/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
  Free
Download
[Request for Court Order and Answer]
8/29/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
9/13/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/13/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 10/13/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/13/2017
  • 10/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 10/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/13/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 10/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial re: after motion to vacate scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 10/13/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Kinder on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 06/22/2017 is vacated
  • 10/13/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joseph Kinder on 03/01/2017, judgment entered on 06/22/2017 as to Kerri Suzzane Kresinski is vacated
  • 09/13/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: As to: Joseph Kinder (Plaintiff)
  • 09/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 09/11/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result changed from Granted to Granted in Part
  • 08/30/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information: Status Date changed from 08/29/2017 to 08/30/2017
  • 08/30/2017
  • Address for Kerri Suzzane Kresinski (Defendant) customer request
  • 08/30/2017
  • Address for Kerri Suzzane Kresinski (Defendant) customer request
  • 08/29/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Kerri Suzzane Kresinski (Defendant)
  • 08/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/29/2017
  • Rejection Sheet FAX FILING OF MC-040 - Rejected; Submitted by: Clerk
  • 08/29/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joseph Kinder (Plaintiff)
  • 08/24/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 10/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 08/24/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/23/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: Kerri Suzzane Kresinski (Defendant)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --