HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2017 09:44:27

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Susan Shellock against John Smurda in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1706
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    William Mctaggart
  • Courthouse

    Inglewood Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Shellock Susan
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Smurda John Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Smurda Genevieve Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)...
7/18/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)...
5/24/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/22/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
7/13/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/24/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Docu...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
3/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/06/2017
6/6/2017: Minute Order of 06/06/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/06/2017
4/6/2017: Minute Order of 04/06/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 10/04/2017
  • 07/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk
  • 07/13/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Susan Shellock (Plaintiff)
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 09/13/2017
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Susan Shellock (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015224 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/08/2017
  • 06/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 06/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/23/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8
  • 06/23/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 06/06/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .
  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/06/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/06/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/24/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: John Smurda (Defendant); Genevieve Smurda (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --