HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:09:52

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Lunitta Myers against David Fralick in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2117
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Myers Lunitta
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Fralick David Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/19/2017: Minute Order of 06/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/26/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
7/18/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/26/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
7/6/2017: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/18/2017
  • 07/18/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Court
  • 07/06/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: LUNITTA MYERS (Plaintiff)
  • 06/22/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $1.00; Balance: $1.00;
  • 06/22/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $1.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0014586 (Cash)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 06/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff LUNITTA MYERS against Defendant DAVID FRALICK on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LUNITTA MYERS on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,900.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,990.00.
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/19/2017
  • 04/26/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LUNITTA MYERS (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID FRALICK (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/25/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: LUNITTA MYERS (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LUNITTA MYERS (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID FRALICK (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LUNITTA MYERS (Plaintiff)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --