HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:53:14

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by E D R Design Construction Inc against Ivan D Rothman in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2115
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    E.d.r. Design & Construction Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Rothman Ivan D. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Greene Sharon Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    E.d.r. Design & Construction Inc.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Rothman Ivan D.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/4/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/24/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cla...
4/13/2017: Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Cl...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/4/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/24/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 05/24/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff); IVAN D. ROTHMAN (Defendant); SHARON GREENE (Defendant)
  • 05/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/13/2017
  • Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim (Defendant's Claim); Filed by: As to: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 27.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/06/2017
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 04/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/24/2017
  • 04/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 04/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/12/2017
  • 04/04/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: IVAN D. ROTHMAN (Defendant); As to: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff)
  • 04/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0011355 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/04/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: IVAN D. ROTHMAN (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 04/04/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0011353 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff); As to: IVAN D. ROTHMAN (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/14/2017
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SHARON GREENE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/16/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: E.D.R. DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. (Plaintiff); As to: IVAN D. ROTHMAN (Defendant); SHARON GREENE (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010315 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010315 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --