HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:53:07

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Winnetka Auto Mall against Iman Z Shaw in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2113
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Shaw Iman Z. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Winnetka Auto Mall
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Access Insurance Company A Corp Dba Access General Insurance Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request for Court Order and Answer]
9/5/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
9/22/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/1/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/11/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
6/15/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/20/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
4/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
4/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Befor...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/22/2017
  • 09/22/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by:
  • 09/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff)
  • 09/01/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Non-Party
  • 06/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff)
  • 06/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/15/2017
  • 06/15/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff); As to: ACCESS INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORP (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/19/2017
  • 04/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: IMAN Z. SHAW (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/21/2017
  • 04/11/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/11/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff); As to: IMAN Z. SHAW (Defendant); ACCESS INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORP (Defendant)
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No
  • 04/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 04/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 06/15/2017
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff); As to: IMAN Z. SHAW (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/15/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: WINNETKA AUTO MALL (Plaintiff); As to: IMAN Z. SHAW (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010309 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --