HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:52:41

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Kenneth Greenwood against Alejandro Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma Fernandez in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2106
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Greenwood Kenneth
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Moctezuma Fernandez Alejandro Cuauhtemoc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/23/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/3/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/17/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/8/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before...
4/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Befor...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/19/2017
6/19/2017: Minute Order of 06/19/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/21/2017 to 08/25/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/25/2017 to 08/25/2017
  • 08/23/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Kenneth Greenwood (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma Fernandez (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 08/03/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Held - Continued to 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Held - Continued to 07/21/2017
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Kenneth Greenwood against Defendant Alejandro Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma Fernandez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kenneth Greenwood on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $4,650.00 and costs of $165.00 for a total of $4,815.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 07/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)
  • 06/20/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 06/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/19/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 06/19/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kenneth Greenwood (Plaintiff); As to: Alejandro Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma Fernandez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/29/2017; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --