HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:52:26

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Marielle Epstein against Harris Capital Investments Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2102
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Harris Capital Investments Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Epstein Marielle
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
5/8/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Marielle Epstein against Defendant Harris Capital Investments, Inc on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Marielle Epstein on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $2,714.07 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,804.07.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $90.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Harris Capital Investments, Inc. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Marielle Epstein (Plaintiff); As to: Harris Capital Investments, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/16/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marielle Epstein (Plaintiff); As to: Harris Capital Investments, Inc (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Marielle Epstein (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marielle Epstein (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010280 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010280 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --