HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:52:19

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Yuri Arely Montalvo in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2100
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Don Roberto Jewelers Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Montalvo Yuri Arely Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
7/27/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order f...
7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/8/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Application and Order to Produce Statement of Asse...
6/14/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Ass...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 07/27/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 07/27/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/14/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Yuri Arely Montalvo (Defendant)
  • 06/14/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0014204 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 06/14/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Defendant Yuri Arely Montalvo on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $1,316.93 and costs of $95.00 for a total of $1,411.93.
  • 05/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Yuri Arely Montalvo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/17; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010277 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Yuri Arely Montalvo (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --