HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:52:04

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Boris Yepiskoposyan against Yervand Sargsyan in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2097
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Sargsyan Yervand Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Yepiskoposyan Boris
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Yepiskoposyan Boris
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Undetermined

    Sargsyan Yervand
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfac...
7/25/2017: [Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfa...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/13/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/9/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/10/2017: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims...
  Fees Apply
Download
Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfact...
7/14/2017: Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfac...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/24/2017 to 07/25/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 07/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/25/2017 to 07/25/2017
  • 07/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $0.50; Balance: $0.50;
  • 07/14/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $0.50 Receipt: VE-2017-0015325 (Cash)
  • 07/14/2017
  • Declaration of Judgment Debtor Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant); Satisfied: Yes
  • 04/28/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/24/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Boris Yepiskoposyan against Defendant Yervand Sargsyan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Boris Yepiskoposyan on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $5,115.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 04/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Yervand Sargsyan on 03/10/2017: Plaintiff Boris Yepiskoposyan does not owe the defendant Yervand Sargsyan any money on defendant's claim. Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to defendant Contested
  • 04/24/2017
  • Address for Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant) updated
  • 03/13/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant); As to: Boris Yepiskoposyan (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/11/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/10/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant); As to: Boris Yepiskoposyan (Plaintiff)
  • 03/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010511 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/09/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Boris Yepiskoposyan (Plaintiff); As to: Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/07/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Boris Yepiskoposyan (Plaintiff); As to: Yervand Sargsyan (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010273 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --