HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:46

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Allesandrea Reyes against Irma Garcia in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2092
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Garcia Irma Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Reyes Allesandrea
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
8/10/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
5/1/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/11/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/11/2017: Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/02/2017
5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
7/11/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review)
5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/14/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/11/2017 to 08/14/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 08/14/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/14/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/14/2017 to 08/14/2017
  • 08/10/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Allesandrea Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Irma Garcia (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 07/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/11/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/11/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 07/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 07/11/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/11/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Allesandrea Reyes against Defendant Irma Garcia on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Allesandrea Reyes on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $6,900.00 and costs of $130.00 for a total of $7,030.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 05/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court to 07/11/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/02/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/02/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Allesandrea Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Irma Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/22/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Irma Garcia (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
  • 05/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0012404 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Allesandrea Reyes (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Allesandrea Reyes (Plaintiff)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010265 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --