HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:43

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tal Burshtein against Memedged Tennet Shemesh in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2078
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Memedged Tennet Shemesh Teton Solar Construction Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Burshtein Tal
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Memedged Tennet Shemesh Corporate Teton Solar Construction Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]
7/27/2017: [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
7/18/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer
6/21/2017: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
5/9/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
6/9/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
  Fees Apply
Download
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
6/28/2017: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
6/9/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment)
  • 09/08/2017
  • Hearing on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment scheduled for 09/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 09/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/27/2017
  • Hearing on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment scheduled for 09/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 07/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/04/2017 to 07/21/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 07/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/21/2017 to 07/21/2017
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer: Result: Signed and Filed; Result Date: 07/18/2017
  • 07/18/2017
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: TAL BURSHTEIN (Plaintiff)
  • 07/17/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: TAL BURSHTEIN (Plaintiff); As to: MEMEDGED TENNET SHEMESH CORPORATE (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 06/28/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/21/2017
  • Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: TAL BURSHTEIN (Plaintiff)
  • 06/09/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: MEMEDGED TENNET SHEMESH CORPORATE (Defendant)
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 06/09/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 06/09/2017; Disposition Type: Denied; Disposition Date changed from 06/09/2017 to 06/09/2017
  • 06/09/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/09/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 06/09/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: MEMEDGED TENNET SHEMESH CORPORATE (Defendant)
  • 05/09/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0012782 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/09/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 06/09/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --