HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Juan C Valle in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2075
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Don Roberto Jewelers Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Valle Juan C Dba Carlos Valle Argueta Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
4/20/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/28/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/20/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 04/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/20/2017
  • 04/20/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Juan C Valle (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/22/17
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Juan C Valle (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010253 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --