HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:28

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Amy Clark against Valley Presbyterian Hospital in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2074
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Valley Presbyterian Hospital Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Valley Presbyterian Emeregency Medical Associates Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Clark Amy
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Valley Presbyterian Hospital Dba Olmstead Memorial Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Cardle Lori Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
3/13/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/13/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Amy Clark (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Presbyterian Hospital (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/16/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/13/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/13/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Amy Clark (Plaintiff); As to: Lori Cardle (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/13/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: Amy Clark (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Amy Clark (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Presbyterian Hospital (Defendant); Lori Cardle (Defendant); Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Inc (Defendant); Valley Presbyterian Emeregency MEdical Associates (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Amy Clark (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Amy Clark (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010252 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010252 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --