HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:09:06

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Joann Culligan against Dewitt C Day in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2073
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Culligan Joann
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Day Dewitt C. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/28/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff JOANN CULLIGAN against Defendant DEWITT C. DAY on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JOANN CULLIGAN on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00, interest of $187.47, and costs of $168.50 for a total of $2,855.97.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to defendant Uncontested
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JOANN CULLIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DEWITT C. DAY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/23/17; Service Cost: 93.50; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JOANN CULLIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: DEWITT C. DAY (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010251 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --