HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:21

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Aida Yaghoubian against Best Quality Market Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2072
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Yaghoubian Aida
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Best Quality Market Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/8/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
5/8/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
6/19/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/20/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/08/2017 to 06/20/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/20/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/20/2017 to 06/20/2017
  • 06/19/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: AIDA YAGHOUBIAN (Plaintiff); As to: BEST QUALITY MARKET, INC. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 05/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/08/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff AIDA YAGHOUBIAN against Defendant BEST QUALITY MARKET, INC. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AIDA YAGHOUBIAN on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $2,575.00.
  • 05/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: BEST QUALITY MARKET, INC. (Defendant)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/08/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/08/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: AIDA YAGHOUBIAN (Plaintiff); As to: BEST QUALITY MARKET, INC. (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010250 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --