HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:51:17

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Kevin Cobbs against Alla Rapoport in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2071
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Rapoport Vadim M Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Barry Kevin Eugene
  • Defendant

    Rapoport Alla Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Barry Kevin Eugene
  • Plaintiff

    Cobbs Kevin
  • Represented By:

    • Song Joohan
  • Undetermined

    Barry Kevin Eugene
  • Represented By:

    • Def
  • Undetermined

    Song Joohan
  • Represented By:

    • Plain

Court Documents

Unknown
8/8/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Substitution of Attorney
5/31/2017: Substitution of Attorney
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)
5/31/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
5/31/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/06/2017
7/6/2017: Minute Order of 07/06/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/30/2017
6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/08/2017
5/8/2017: Minute Order of 05/08/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appea...
6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appe...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/8/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 07/21/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
  • 07/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/05/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 07/03/2017
  • Updated -- Substitution of Attorney: Filed By Parties: Vadim M Rapoport (Defendant) ; As To Parties: Vadim M Rapoport (Defendant)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by:
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment: Result: Result Date: 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 06/30/2017
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/30/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 06/30/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/30/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kevin Cobbs on 03/02/2017, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Vadim M Rapoport
  • 06/30/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kevin Cobbs on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/08/2017 is vacated
  • 06/30/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kevin Cobbs on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/08/2017 as to Alla Rapoport is vacated
  • 06/30/2017
  • Brief Defendant's Trial Brief; Filed by: Alla Rapoport (Defendant)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $3.00; Balance: $3.00;
  • 06/29/2017
  • Payment: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Amount: $3.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0014833 (Credit Card)
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --