HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:09:02

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Justin Ayarra against Tyler Daniel Shaw-spidle in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2070
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Ayarra Justin
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Shaw Monica Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Palacios Ana
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Shaw-spidle Tyler Daniel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/29/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
8/4/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/4/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
4/18/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
5/3/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/03/2017
5/3/2017: Minute Order of 05/03/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Declaration about Proof of Service
10/16/2017: Declaration about Proof of Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Declaration (name extension) - Witness
5/12/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Witness
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P; Reason: Judicial Officer not available
  • 10/05/2017
  • Updated -- Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination: Location changed from Department Z to Department P
  • 10/03/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued and Filed by: JUSTIN AYARRA (Plaintiff); ANA PALACIOS (Plaintiff)
  • 09/22/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: JUSTIN AYARRA (Plaintiff); As to: MONICA SHAW (Defendant)
  • 09/22/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 09/22/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: JUSTIN AYARRA (Plaintiff); As to: TYLER DANIEL SHAW-SPIDLE (Defendant)
  • 09/22/2017
  • Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: MONICA SHAW (Defendant)
  • 09/22/2017
  • Certificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment; Issued by: Clerk; As to: TYLER DANIEL SHAW-SPIDLE (Defendant)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/04/2017
  • 08/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 08/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/04/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff JUSTIN AYARRA and Plaintiff ANA PALACIOS against Defendant MONICA SHAW and Defendant TYLER DANIEL SHAW-SPIDLE on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JUSTIN AYARRA, et al. on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $8,200.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $8,250.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 08/04/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JUSTIN AYARRA, et al. on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 is vacated
  • 08/04/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JUSTIN AYARRA, et al. on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 as to MONICA SHAW is vacated
  • 08/04/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JUSTIN AYARRA, et al. on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 05/04/2017 as to TYLER DANIEL SHAW-SPIDLE is vacated
  • 07/17/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL "Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration"; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: MONICA SHAW (Defendant)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: JUSTIN AYARRA (Plaintiff); ANA PALACIOS (Plaintiff)
  • 06/29/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Motion to Vacate - CCP 116.745; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 20.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0014811 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --