HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:08:57

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by David A Palos against Manuel Regalado in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2069
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Palos David A.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Regalado Manuel Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Free
Download
Unknown
9/15/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/4/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P; Reason: Judicial Officer not available
  • 09/18/2017
  • Updated -- Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination: Location changed from Department Z to Department P
  • 09/15/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: DAVID A. PALOS (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL REGALADO (Defendant)
  • 09/15/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/04/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff DAVID A. PALOS against Defendant MANUEL REGALADO on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by DAVID A. PALOS on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $5,090.00.
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DAVID A. PALOS (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL REGALADO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/16/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: DAVID A. PALOS (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL REGALADO (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010246 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --