HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:08:53

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by David A Palos against Fariba Farzin Khoubian in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2068
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Palos David A.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Khoubian Fariba Farzin Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Chemerinski Eliel

Court Documents

Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
7/10/2017: Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
8/25/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vaca...
  Free
Download
(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
8/25/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  Free
Download
[Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Denial of Motion t...
8/31/2017: [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Denial of Motion ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/31/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/31/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
7/10/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/04/2017
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Den...
10/6/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - De...
  Fees Apply
Download
(Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion...
10/6/2017: (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motio...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Eliel Chemerinski (Attorney); As to: FARIBA FARZIN KHOUBIAN (Defendant)
  • 10/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate)
  • 10/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate) of 10/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 10/06/2017
  • , Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 10/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department P RES to 10/30/2017 09:30 AM at 10/30/2017 9:30 AM Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate in Department P
  • 09/15/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: DAVID A. PALOS (Plaintiff); As to: FARIBA FARZIN KHOUBIAN (Defendant)
  • 09/15/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 10/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 08/31/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Denial of Motion to Vacate; Filed by: FARIBA FARZIN KHOUBIAN (Defendant)
  • 08/31/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Denial of Motion to Vacate); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/31/2017
  • Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 08/31/2017
  • Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 10/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 08/31/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Denial of Motion to Vacate)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/31/2017
  • Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Denial of Motion to Vacate scheduled for 10/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)
  • 08/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/25/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 08/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: FARIBA FARZIN KHOUBIAN (Defendant)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 07/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 07/10/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/10/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --