HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:58

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ivan M Silva against Robert Lara in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2066
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Lara Robert Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Valle Geovani
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Silva Ivan M
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Gallegos Luis F
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - : Minute Order Dated 05/04/2017 (N...
5/23/2017: RETURNED MAIL - : Minute Order Dated 05/04/2017 (...
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
4/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/04/2017
5/4/2017: Minute Order of 05/04/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • Updated -- RETURNED MAIL : Minute Order Dated 05/04/2017 (Non-Jury Trial): Filed By Parties: IVAN M SILVA (Plaintiff)
  • 05/23/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL : Minute Order Dated 05/04/2017 (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by:
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/04/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/04/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: IVAN M SILVA (Plaintiff); GEOVANI VALLE (Plaintiff); LUIS F GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT LARA (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/28/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: IVAN M SILVA (Plaintiff); GEOVANI VALLE (Plaintiff); LUIS F GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT LARA (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: IVAN M SILVA (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: IVAN M SILVA (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: GEOVANI VALLE (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: GEOVANI VALLE (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LUIS F GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: LUIS F GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010244 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --