HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:54

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Aleksandar Filipovic against Ally Financial Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2065
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Ally Financial Inc. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Filipovic Aleksandar
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/11/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
4/11/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
5/1/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
4/12/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
3/10/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/01/2017
5/1/2017: Minute Order of 05/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/12/2017
4/12/2017: Minute Order of 04/12/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Fee Waiver Hearing)
3/17/2017: Minute Order - (Fee Waiver Hearing)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Court Order)
3/2/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Court Order)
3/10/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: ALEKSANDAR FILIPOVIC (Plaintiff)
  • 05/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/11/2017
  • 05/11/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 05/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/01/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Court
  • 04/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 04/12/2017
  • 04/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 04/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/12/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Court
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: ALEKSANDAR FILIPOVIC (Plaintiff)
  • 03/30/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: ALEKSANDAR FILIPOVIC (Plaintiff)
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ALEKSANDAR FILIPOVIC (Plaintiff); As to: ALLY FINANCIAL INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/22/2017
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ALEKSANDAR FILIPOVIC (Plaintiff); As to: ALLY FINANCIAL INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/22/2017
  • 03/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Fee Waiver Hearing)
  • 03/17/2017
  • Fee Waiver Hearing scheduled for 03/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 03/17/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/10/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/10/2017
  • 03/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 03/10/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/10/2017; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --