HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:51

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Jane Chaudron Q against Mike Ross in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2059
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Chaudron Jane Q
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Ross Mike Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/4/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: JANE CHAUDRON, Q (Plaintiff)
  • 05/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/04/2017
  • 05/04/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JANE CHAUDRON, Q (Plaintiff); As to: MIKE ROSS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/23/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JANE CHAUDRON, Q (Plaintiff); As to: MIKE ROSS (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010236 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --