HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:08:43

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Osvaldo Cortez Arteaga against Myee Tiuis in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2057
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Tiuis Myee Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Arteaga Osvaldo Cortez
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Request for Court Order and Answer]
9/22/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
8/7/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/7/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
7/13/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
7/13/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/20/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order f...
7/13/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
7/13/2017: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/21/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA (Plaintiff)
  • 08/07/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/07/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result Date changed from 07/31/2017 to 08/07/2017
  • 08/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/31/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/31/2017
  • 07/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA (Plaintiff); As to: MYEE TIUIS (Defendant); Costs: 35.00
  • 07/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Updated -- Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination: Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/13/2017
  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2017
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA (Plaintiff)
  • 07/13/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/25/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: As to: MYEE TIUIS (Defendant)
  • 05/25/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0013428 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 05/25/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/20/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA against Defendant MYEE TIUIS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $4,500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $4,590.00.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to defendant Uncontested
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: OSVALDO CORTEZ ARTEAGA (Plaintiff); As to: MYEE TIUIS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/17/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --