HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:08:39

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Scott Steinhardt against Department Of Water And Power in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2056
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Department Of Water And Power Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Steinhardt Scott
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
6/6/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declarati...
  Free
Download
Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
6/5/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaratio...
  Free
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vac...
  Free
Download
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
7/7/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacat...
  Free
Download
[Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo)]
9/20/2017: [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo)]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
6/26/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
3/30/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/28/2017
6/28/2017: Minute Order of 06/28/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
8/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Notice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/20/2017
  • Address for Department of Water and Power (Defendant) updated
  • 09/20/2017
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A
  • 09/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Department of Water and Power (Defendant)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Department of Water and Power (Defendant)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo); Filed by: Clerk
  • 09/18/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A
  • 08/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 08/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 08/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 08/21/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 08/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Scott Steinhardt against Defendant Department of Water and Power on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Scott Steinhardt on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $175.00 for a total of $5,175.00.
  • 08/03/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 08/21/2017 08:30 AM at 08/21/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department P
  • 08/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 08/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 08/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --