HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:40

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Celis Alvarez Batres against Sara Maldinera Ramos in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2055
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Batres Celis Alvarez
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Ramos Sara Maldinera Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/2/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/25/2017
4/25/2017: Minute Order of 04/25/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Celis Alvarez Batres (Plaintiff); As to: Sara Maldinera Ramos (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Celis Alvarez Batres (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Celis Alvarez Batres (Plaintiff)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010228 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $7.50; Payment: 7.50 Receipt: VE-2017-0010228 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --