HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:36

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by John Kolt against Ideal Fitness Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2049
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Lawrence P. Riff
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Ideal Fitness Inc Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Mcburney Radina Dina Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Gates Wade Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Kolt John
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Subpoena & Proof of Service
4/21/2017: Subpoena & Proof of Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
5/3/2017: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
5/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
5/2/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: John Kolt (Plaintiff)
  • 05/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/03/2017
  • 05/03/2017
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Ideal Fitness Inc (Defendant) to Wade Gates (Defendant)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Firdaus F. Dordi at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z; Reason: Other
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: John Kolt (Plaintiff); As to: Radina Dina McBurney (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: John Kolt (Plaintiff); As to: Wade Gates (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/26/2017
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: John Kolt (Plaintiff); As to: Wade Gates (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Wade Gates (Defendant) to Ideal Fitness Inc (Defendant)
  • 05/02/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Wade Gates (Defendant) to Ideal Fitness Inc (Defendant)
  • 04/21/2017
  • Subpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by:
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: John Kolt (Plaintiff); As to: Ideal Fitness Inc (Defendant); Wade Gates (Defendant); Radina Dina McBurney (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010223 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --