HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:32

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Mike Hays against Mary L Simpson in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2020
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Simpson Mary L Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Hays Mike
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
4/18/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 04/18/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Mike Hays (Plaintiff)
  • 04/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/18/2017
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Mike Hays (Plaintiff); As to: Mary L Simpson (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/17/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mike Hays (Plaintiff); As to: Mary L Simpson (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010218 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Balance: $5.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $5.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010219 (Cash)

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --