HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:24

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Julie Fodulyan against A-absolute Appliance Inc in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2014
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Fodulyan Julie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Vilshenker Ilya Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    A-absolute Appliance Inc Dba Aaa Appliance Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/18/2017
4/18/2017: Minute Order of 04/18/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/18/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/18/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/18/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Julie Fodulyan (Plaintiff); As to: A-Absolute Appliance Inc, (Defendant); Ilya Vilshenker (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010202 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --