HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:14

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Modern Finance Co Inc against Armando Garcia in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX2001
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Garcia Armando Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Modern Finance Co Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
4/25/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - No Service
3/10/2017: Proof of Service - No Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment...
6/2/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment...
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/25/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); Interest: 21.30
  • 06/02/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;
  • 06/02/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0013750 (Check)
  • 06/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MODERN FINANCE CO. INC. against Defendant ARMANDO GARCIA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Modern Finance Co Inc on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $2,580.00.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to defendant Uncontested
  • 04/25/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 04/25/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: ARMANDO GARCIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/05/2017; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 04/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 04/25/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service was file on 03/09/2017 and with the substituted service dated 04/25/2017; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: ARMANDO GARCIA (Defendant); Costs: 30.00
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: ARMANDO GARCIA (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010183 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --