HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:50:02

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Brittani Ebert against Jonathan Pine in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX1998
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Richard F. Walmark
  • Courthouse

    Van Nuys Courthouse East
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Ebert Brittani
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Pine Jonathan Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Cohen Emily Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
3/21/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
5/15/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
5/18/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/17/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request for Court Order
6/7/2017: Order on Request for Court Order
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 07/14/2017
7/14/2017: Minute Order of 07/14/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/07/2017
6/7/2017: Minute Order of 06/07/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/20/2017
4/20/2017: Minute Order of 04/20/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order...
7/14/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Orde...
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)
  • 07/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/14/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/14/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/08/2017
  • Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
  • 06/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/07/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Issued by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Brittani Ebert (Plaintiff)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: Brittani Ebert (Plaintiff)
  • 05/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/15/2017
  • 05/15/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/15/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $2.00; Balance: $2.00;
  • 05/15/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $2.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0012994 (Cash)
  • 04/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P
  • 04/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 06/08/2017
  • 04/20/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Filed By Parties changed from Brittani Ebert (Plaintiff) to Jonathan Pine (Defendant) ; Result Date: 04/20/2017; As To Parties: Jonathan Pine (Defendant)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/20/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Brittani Ebert (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --