HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:59

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Isaac Alexander Montano against Jose Roberto Arevalo in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0381
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Randolph A. Rogers
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Montano Isaac Alexander
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Arevalo Jose Roberto Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
4/26/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
4/3/2017: Minute Order of 04/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
5/24/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/01/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/03/2017 to 06/01/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/01/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/01/2017 to 06/01/2017
  • 05/24/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: ISAAC ALEXANDER MONTANO (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ROBERTO AREVALO (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 04/03/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/03/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ISAAC ALEXANDER MONTANO against Defendant JOSE ROBERTO AREVALO on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ISAAC ALEXANDER MONTANO on 03/03/2017 for the principal amount of $7,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $7,115.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 04/03/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/03/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/03/2017
  • 04/03/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 03/23/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: JOSE ROBERTO AREVALO (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/15/2017
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ISAAC ALEXANDER MONTANO (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE ROBERTO AREVALO (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002159 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Randolph A. Rogers at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A15
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --