HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:54

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Ma R Mendoza against Dillan Crook in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0380
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Mendoza Ma R.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Crook Dillan Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Postponement
4/17/2017: Notice of Postponement
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/22/2017
5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 05/22/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Held - Continued to 05/22/2017
  • 04/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14
  • 04/17/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by:
  • 04/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MA R. MENDOZA (Plaintiff); As to: DILLAN CROOK (Defendant)
  • 03/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002158 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14
  • 03/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --