HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:48

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Malika Jeffery against Anthony Davis in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0373
  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Davis Anthony Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Jeffery Malika
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]
4/28/2017: [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
4/28/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/3/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
4/28/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/9/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
4/28/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/11/2017
5/11/2017: Minute Order of 05/11/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 05/11/2017
5/11/2017: Minute Order of 05/11/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appea...
6/6/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appea...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
6/9/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
More Documents Available

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 06/09/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 06/09/2017
  • 06/09/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/09/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MALIKA JEFFERY on 03/03/2017: Defendant ANTHONY DAVIS does not owe the plaintiff MALIKA JEFFERY any money on plaintiff's claim.
  • 06/09/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MALIKA JEFFERY on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 04/12/2017 is vacated
  • 06/09/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MALIKA JEFFERY on 03/03/2017, judgment entered on 04/12/2017 as to ANTHONY DAVIS is vacated
  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 06/06/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10 updated: Result Date to 06/06/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 05/11/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10
  • 05/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
  • 05/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/11/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/11/2017
  • 04/28/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees
  • 04/28/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted
  • 04/28/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: As to: ANTHONY DAVIS (Defendant)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: ANTHONY DAVIS (Defendant)
  • 04/28/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002568 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/28/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --