HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:07:51

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Laurie Friedman against Finest Movers in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0367
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Friedman Laurie
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Finest Movers Dba East Coast Moving And Storage Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

(Court Order - Motion to amend Judgment to reflect...
8/21/2017: (Court Order - Motion to amend Judgment to reflec...
  Free
Download
(Court Order - To Enable Creditor to Enforce Judgm...
8/22/2017: (Court Order - To Enable Creditor to Enforce Judg...
  Free
Download
[Request for Court Order and Answer]
7/11/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]
  Fees Apply
Download
[Order on Request for Court Order]
8/25/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
8/22/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
9/5/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request for Court Order and Answer
7/7/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/14/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/24/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/24/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: LAURIE FRIEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: FINEST MOVERS (Defendant); Interest: 187.24
  • 09/05/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk
  • 08/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 08/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order - To Enable Creditor to Enforce Judgment and Amen...)
  • 08/22/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: As to: FINEST MOVERS (Defendant)
  • 08/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order - Motion to amend Judgment to reflect the legal n...)
  • 07/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk
  • 07/07/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: LAURIE FRIEDMAN (Plaintiff)
  • 04/24/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff LAURIE FRIEDMAN against Defendant FINEST MOVERS DBA EAST COAST MOVING AND STORAGE on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LAURIE FRIEDMAN on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $5,100.00, joint and several.
  • 04/24/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/24/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/24/2017
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LAURIE FRIEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: FINEST MOVERS (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/08/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LAURIE FRIEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: FINEST MOVERS (Defendant)
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002138 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --