HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:07:48

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Shaunt Shahini against Min Kyung Chang in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0366
  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Shahini Shaunt
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Chang Min Kyung Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
4/20/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment
  Free
Download
[Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal...
6/1/2017: [Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal...
  Free
Download
[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/7/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) ...
4/7/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Small Claims Appeal
4/20/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
4/3/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Infor...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appea...
5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appe...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
6/1/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date changed from 05/23/2017 to 06/01/2017
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff SHAUNT SHAHINI against Defendant MIN KYUNG CHANG on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHAUNT SHAHINI on 03/02/2017 for the principal amount of $4,017.00 for a total of $4,017.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.
  • 06/01/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHAUNT SHAHINI on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 04/12/2017 is vacated
  • 06/01/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHAUNT SHAHINI on 03/02/2017, judgment entered on 04/12/2017 as to MIN KYUNG CHANG is vacated
  • 06/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal), Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment: Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017
  • 05/23/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission
  • 04/24/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002524 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: MIN KYUNG CHANG (Defendant)
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/14/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10
  • 04/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/12/2017
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/12/2017
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information: Result: Result Date: 04/12/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --