HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:26

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Antelope Valley Nissan Inc against Lorine Williams in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0362
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Randolph A. Rogers
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff

    Antelope Valley Nissan Inc
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Williams Lorine Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Unknown
9/25/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/26/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
4/26/2017: Minute Order of 04/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/26/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small ...
4/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small...
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC (Plaintiff); As to: LORINE WILLIAMS (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
  • 09/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/26/2017 to 09/25/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied
  • 09/25/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/25/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/25/2017 to 09/25/2017
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/26/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC against Defendant LORINE WILLIAMS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $1,000.00 and costs of $65.00 for a total of $1,065.00.; Payments are to be made at the rate of $100.00 per month, beginning on 05/20/2017 and on 20th of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Other: If payments made without default, obligation to be paid without additional interest. Upon 7 days or more default, entire principal plus accrued interest from date of judgment to be immediately due and payable.
  • 04/26/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party
  • 04/26/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/26/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/26/2017
  • 04/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/26/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 03/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC (Plaintiff); As to: LORINE WILLIAMS (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2017
  • 03/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002133 (Check); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ANTELOPE VALLEY NISSAN, INC (Plaintiff); As to: LORINE WILLIAMS (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Randolph A. Rogers at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A15
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --