HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:16

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Roger A Guadamuz Reyes against Robert E Nameche Jr in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0358
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Randolph A. Rogers
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Nameche Jr. Robert E. Aka Robert E. Nameche Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Guadamuz Reyes Roger A.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)...
4/7/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)...
  Fees Apply
Download
[Notice of Rejection]
3/14/2017: [Notice of Rejection]
  Fees Apply
Download
Unknown
7/21/2017: Unknown
  Fees Apply
Download
Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/4/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
4/6/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Rejection
3/14/2017: Notice of Rejection
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
6/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 06/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Sta...
6/14/2017: Minute Order of 06/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor St...
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
6/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Roger A. Guadamuz Reyes (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 51.19; Credits: 0.00
  • 07/21/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
  • 07/21/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;
  • 07/21/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0003232 (Cash)
  • 06/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/17/2017 to 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/17/2017 to 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 05/17/2017 to 06/14/2017
  • 06/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 06/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 06/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Roger A. Guadamuz Reyes against Defendant Robert E. Nameche Jr. AKA Robert E. Nameche on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Robert A. Guadamuz Reyes on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $5,050.00.
  • 05/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 05/17/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/17/2017
  • 05/17/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result Date: 05/17/2017
  • 05/17/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/17/2017
  • 05/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Held - Continued to 06/14/2017
  • 04/07/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted
  • 04/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/17/2017
  • 04/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --