HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:13

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Maria Cruz Suastegui against Travis Alatorre in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0357
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Alatorre Travis Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Suastegui Maria Chavez
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Suastegui Maria Cruz
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/29/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order - Dismissal
4/17/2017: Order - Dismissal
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/17/2017
  • 04/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 04/17/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/17/2017
  • Order for dismissal entered as to entire action
  • 04/17/2017
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by:
  • 04/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/29/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Travis Alatorre (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/28/2017
  • 03/06/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Cruz Suastegui (Plaintiff); As to: Travis Alatorre (Defendant)
  • 03/06/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from MARIA CHAVEZ SUASTEGUI vs TRAVIS ALATORRE to MARIA CRUZ SUASTEGUI vs TRAVIS ALATORRE
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Chavez Suastegui (Plaintiff); As to: Travis Alatorre (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002126 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --