HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 05:49:10

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rebecca Green-dozier against Meena S Corp in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0356
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Randolph A. Rogers
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Meena's Corp. Dba Sun Auto Finance Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Green-dozier Rebecca
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
3/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
3/1/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order of 04/17/2017
4/17/2017: Minute Order of 04/17/2017
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 04/17/2017
  • 04/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 04/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk
  • 04/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 04/17/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/17/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 583.410(a) c.c.p
  • 04/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 03/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Meena's Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/08/2017
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rebecca Green-Dozier (Plaintiff); As to: Meena's Corp. (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Rebecca Green-Dozier (Plaintiff)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Rebecca Green-Dozier (Plaintiff)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002125 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Randolph A. Rogers at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A15
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15
  • 03/01/2017
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/01/2017 to 03/01/2017
More Dockets Available

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --