HomePricingAboutBlogContact UsLogout
menu
arrow_back
Home
Pricing
About
Blog
Contact Us
Logout

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 09:07:40

Get the Latest Case Information Available: autorenew Update this Case flagTrack this Case

autorenew Update this Case
flagTrack this Case

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by James F Weiherer against David O Franco in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number

    XXXXXXX0355
  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017
  • Case Status

    Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim View More
  • Jurisdiction

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge

    Brian C. Yep
  • Courthouse

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
  • County

    Los Angeles
  • State

    California

Party Details

  • Defendant

    Aguilar Mariana Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Weimerer Aracely
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Plaintiff

    Weiherer James F.
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?
  • Defendant

    Franco David O. Get help with your lawsuit?
  • Represented By:

    • Unrepresented Need help finding an Attorney?

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
3/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
  Fees Apply
Download
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
3/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims ...
  Fees Apply
Download
Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
4/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
  Fees Apply
Download
Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
4/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
  Fees Apply
Download

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk
  • 04/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 04/12/2017; Result Type to Held
  • 04/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ARACELY WEIMERER; Plaintiff JAMES F. WEIHERER against Defendant DAVID O. FRANCO; Defendant MARIANA AGUILAR on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by JAMES F. WEIHERER, et al. on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $4,500.00 and costs of $245.00 for a total of $4,745.00, joint and several.
  • 04/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 04/12/2017
  • 04/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 04/12/2017
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JAMES F. WEIHERER (Plaintiff); ARACELY WEIMERER (Plaintiff); As to: MARIANA AGUILAR (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2017; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JAMES F. WEIHERER (Plaintiff); ARACELY WEIMERER (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID O. FRANCO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2017; Service Cost: 160.00; Service Cost Waived: No
  • 03/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JAMES F. WEIHERER (Plaintiff); ARACELY WEIMERER (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID O. FRANCO (Defendant); MARIANA AGUILAR (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002124 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

Disclaimer: UniCourt provides public court records from state and federal courts. These records should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the views of UniCourt.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.

Case Type Details

close

Case Type: Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Case Category: Civil

Description: Cases involving other small claim matters not classified elsewhere --

NOS Code: --

Code Section: --