This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:44:15 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS HARUTUNYAN, KRISTINA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARUTUNYAN, KRISTINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3846

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

HARUTUNYAN KRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF INTEREST

7/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF INTEREST

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

7/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/16/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

7/22/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

7/21/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2017: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - EXHIBIT 1

7/21/2017: Declaration (name extension) - EXHIBIT 1

Declaration (name extension) - NON MILITARY STATUS

7/21/2017: Declaration (name extension) - NON MILITARY STATUS

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

7/21/2017: Declaration (name extension) - WAIVER OF INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

Judgment

8/2/2017: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Randy Rhodes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: KRISTINA HARUTUNYAN (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff); As to: KRISTINA HARUTUNYAN (Defendant); Costs: 25.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF INTEREST; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketAbstract - Request; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketOSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) against Defendant (HARUTUNYAN, KRISTINA) on the Complaint filed by (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) on 03/01/2017 for the principal amount of $5,803.69 and costs of $348.50 for a total of $6,152.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO DEFAULT DESK .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to KRISTINA HARUTUNYAN; On the Complaint filed by (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) on 03/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketDeclaration WAIVER OF INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: (BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HARUTUNYAN, KRISTINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853032. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less